+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 6, (2020 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2021.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Boshart Davis, Holvey.
- Second reading.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/24/2020 9:22 AM)