+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 4, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Lewis, Smith DB, Wilde.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Rules Suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Baertschiger Jr, Burdick, Girod, Golden, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Thatcher, Wagner declared potential conflict of interest.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (6/24/2020 2:10 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (6/25/2020 1:00 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (6/25/2020 3:52 PM)