+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 3, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Reschke, Smith G; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Breese-Iverson, Leif, Smith DB, Wallan, Williams.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Rules Suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Knopp, Prozanski, Taylor, Thatcher.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -4
Proposed (6/24/2020 5:05 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (6/25/2020 9:44 AM)