+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 2, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2020.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Boshart Davis, Holvey.
- Second reading.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (6/24/2020 11:38 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (6/24/2020 1:31 PM)