+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -24
Adopted (2/27/2020 9:11 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/20/2020 10:22 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/20/2020 5:47 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/20/2020 10:46 AM)