+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/5/2020 11:22 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/4/2020 11:24 AM)