+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Winters; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Work Session held.
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson, McLane, Wilson. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 3--Boone, Olson, Sprenger.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 32--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Absent, 1--McKeown; Excused, 3--Boone, Olson, Sprenger.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments, be printed A-Engrossed.
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -MR8
Proposed (2/21/2018 4:50:30 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/20/2018 1:51:04 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/16/2018 2:51:58 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/12/2018 2:20:46 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/9/2018 9:24:52 AM)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor