+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Wallan.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Agriculture and Land Use.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.