+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session scheduled.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (2/28/2018 10:45:32 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/15/2018 3:19:40 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/14/2018 11:16:11 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/13/2018 4:34:03 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/8/2018 1:58:14 PM)