+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Revenue, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -7
Adopted (2/14/2020 10:57 AM)
Amendment -A8
Proposed (2/25/2020 10:09 AM)
Amendment -5
Combined (2/11/2020 12:10 PM)
Amendment -6
Combined (2/10/2020 12:52 PM)