+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 104, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hoyle, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
- Second reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3696
3/3/2014 10:42:52 AM
Amendment #3289
2/10/2014 12:59:30 PM
Amendment #3230
2/10/2014 12:59:30 PM
Amendment #3213
2/10/2014 10:59:39 AM
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor