+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/13/2018 11:37:14 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 8:51:02 AM)