+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 42, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Smith.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, George, Whitsett.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (12)
Amendment #3573
2/21/2014 10:22:28 AM
Amendment #3554
2/20/2014 12:20:38 PM
Amendment #3553
2/20/2014 12:11:08 PM
Amendment #3541
2/20/2014 10:09:48 AM
Amendment #3253
2/10/2014 5:58:51 PM
Amendment #3232
2/10/2014 1:35:59 PM
Amendment #3109
2/5/2014 12:13:16 PM
Amendment #3108
2/5/2014 10:21:52 AM
Amendment #3107
Proposed
Amendment #3088
2/5/2014 12:13:16 PM
Amendment #3080
2/5/2014 10:21:52 AM
Amendment #3079
2/5/2014 10:21:33 AM
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor