+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Johnson; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/15/2018 8:32:05 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 8:32:22 AM)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor