+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Recommended (3/3/2020 10:19 AM)