+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 5, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote explanations filed by Boquist, DeBoer.
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means to adopt the -4 amendment failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Motion to rerefer to Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Barker, Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 23--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2018 Calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/20/2018 9:56:44 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/7/2018 10:05:12 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2018 3:48:18 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/6/2018 3:48:18 PM)