+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (2/19/2016 10:20:19 AM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/18/2016 8:26:40 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/3/2016 1:50:43 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/18/2016 8:44:35 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/18/2016 8:26:40 AM)
Amendment -A3
Proposed (2/18/2016 8:44:35 AM)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor