+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3732
3/6/2014 6:56:21 PM
Amendment #3716
3/5/2014 1:40:49 PM
Amendment #3722
3/5/2014 3:38:39 PM
Amendment #3699
3/3/2014 3:56:48 PM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor