+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 53, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 15, 2016.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Baertschiger Jr, Burdick, Hass, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 5--Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Shields, Winters.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Evans.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 24; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Huffman, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Evans.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (10)
Amendment -A15
Proposed (2/16/2016 9:19:40 AM)
Amendment -11
Adopted (2/9/2016 4:29:55 PM)
Amendment -A13
Proposed (2/12/2016 7:40:59 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/10/2016 12:14:33 PM)
Amendment -A14
Adopted (2/15/2016 11:39:56 AM)
Amendment -10
Proposed (2/8/2016 1:17:48 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/5/2016 5:16:01 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/8/2016 1:50:18 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (2/5/2016 10:45:36 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/3/2016 1:00:17 PM)