+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 9--Cameron, Davis, Freeman, Gallegos, Gilliam, Johnson, McLane, Parrish, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Conger, Hanna, Richardson.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3576
2/19/2014 10:52:58 AM
Amendment #3505
2/19/2014 10:52:58 AM
Amendment #3207
2/10/2014 10:52:40 AM
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor