+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Education.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 1--Stark.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A8
Adopted (2/22/2018 9:00:40 AM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/22/2018 9:00:40 AM)
Amendment -7
Adopted (2/13/2018 9:56:34 AM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/13/2018 7:25:08 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/9/2018 4:22:35 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2018 7:20:40 AM)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor