+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor