+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Lininger.
- Passed.Ayes, 33; Nays, 26--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lininger, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Weidner.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Barton, Rayfield.
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey, Gallegos.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 10, 2016 Calendar.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/3/2016 2:39:32 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor