+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 36, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote explanations filed by Boquist, DeBoer.
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-26 Calendar and placed on 02-27 Calendar on voice vote.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2018 Calendar.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/20/2018 9:26:42 AM)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor