+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (2/27/2018 6:01:24 PM)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (2/26/2018 7:41:53 AM)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (2/23/2018 3:49:20 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/13/2018 2:18:30 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/12/2018 2:25:53 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 9:04:13 AM)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor