+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -10
Adopted (2/16/2016 1:52:46 PM)
Amendment 2
Proposed (2/4/2016 9:12:02 PM)
Amendment 3
Proposed (2/9/2016 6:43:09 PM)
Amendment 4
Proposed (2/9/2016 6:43:23 PM)
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/4/2016 9:12:02 PM)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor