+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Lively. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/28/2018 11:30:32 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/27/2018 8:01:52 AM)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor