+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/12/2020 10:48 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/5/2020 9:04 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/5/2020 2:07 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/12/2020 10:48 AM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/10/2020 1:47 PM)