+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/19/2020 10:52 AM)