+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/12/2020 2:24 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/17/2020 8:53 AM)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (2/27/2020 10:01 AM)