+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 99, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3216
2/10/2014 11:02:05 AM
Amendment #3017
2/3/2014 9:18:19 AM
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor