+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Winters.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Gomberg, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reardon.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor