+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 12, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barton, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 6, 2014 Calendar.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor