+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 8--Bonham, Hayden, Heard, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB, Williamson, Witt.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/13/2018 8:32:06 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/13/2018 8:32:06 AM)