+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Nathanson, Salinas.
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Fahey, Gorsek, Marsh, Nathanson, Prusak, Salinas; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/10/2020 9:20 AM)