+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3428
2/13/2014 11:28:44 AM
Amendment #3336
2/11/2014 4:34:27 PM
Amendment #3430
2/13/2014 11:53:14 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor