+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Marsh, Smith DB, Sollman.
- Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boone, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Lewis, Marsh, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith DB, Sollman, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Stark.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2018 Calendar.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor