+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Johnson, Kruse.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Hernandez; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -10
Adopted (2/26/2018 8:42:05 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/22/2018 9:22:46 AM)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor