+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Post, Weidner, Whitsett.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Olsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye.
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Esquivel, Post, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Barton, Boone.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment -A11
Combined (2/26/2016 9:20:32 AM)
Amendment -A9
Adopted (2/23/2016 5:31:05 PM)
Amendment -4 comb
Combined (2/16/2016 1:50:32 PM)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (2/23/2016 11:04:57 AM)
Amendment -A8
Proposed (2/23/2016 11:04:57 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/11/2016 2:44:07 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/4/2016 11:26:01 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/4/2016 8:12:46 AM)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor