+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Gomberg, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Post, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/10/2020 11:33 AM)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (2/20/2020 10:31 AM)