+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/12/2018 5:16:15 PM)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor