+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 43, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Bates, Dembrow, Gelser, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Steiner Hayward; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-26 by unanimous consent.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-25 by unanimous consent.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Bentz, Johnson; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Heard.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (2/18/2016 8:10:34 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/18/2016 8:10:34 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/3/2016 12:14:29 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor