+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 94, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Sprenger, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Bentz, Cameron, Davis, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Conger, Hanna, Richardson.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3629
2/25/2014 8:28:59 AM
Amendment #3347
2/11/2014 5:17:23 PM
Amendment #3051
2/4/2014 11:43:01 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor