+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor