+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/18/2020 10:47 AM)
Amendment -1
Combined (2/10/2020 11:37 AM)
Amendment -2
Combined (2/13/2020 10:21 AM)