+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 2, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.