+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 11, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3173
2/10/2014 8:10:32 AM
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor