+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 59, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Johnson, Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Amendments distributed.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed. Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Boles; Excused, 2--McKeown, Stark.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (2/26/2018 11:48 AM)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (2/26/2018 11:48 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/14/2018 3:02 PM)
Amendment -2
Combined (2/12/2018 12:35 PM)
Amendment -3
Combined (2/12/2018 12:35 PM)