+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3252
2/10/2014 5:58:30 PM
Amendment #3365
2/10/2014 5:58:30 PM
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor