+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to withdraw from Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness failed.Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gelser, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3241
2/10/2014 2:42:30 PM
Amendment #3129
2/6/2014 12:34:12 PM
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor